+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 060, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161).
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Act 060, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161).
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Luke, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 170).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 170) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:05PM in conference room 229.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Luke Co-Chairs; Ward.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, Fevella.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 732).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2184) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1444) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 86) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1025) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 105) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor