+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to WAM.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2826) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kahele; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-14 9:10AM in conference room 211.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-14 10:35AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ENE/EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2218) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Chun Oakland, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
- The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Chun Oakland, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-14 2:50PM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/EGH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor