+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 253) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-08-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2751) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 1:30PM in conference room 211.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2088) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Wakai.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA deferred the measure until 02-05-16 2:50PM in conference room 224.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WLA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor