+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 251) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2719) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Taniguchi.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:40AM in conference room 211.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2058) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Dela Cruz.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-16 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor