+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 44
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 312) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2613) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Wakai.
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-21-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
- The committee(s) on JDC/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-18 9:55AM in conference room 211.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2432) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Harimoto, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Wakai.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-18 3:00PM in conference room 016.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS, JDC/WAM.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/JDC, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor