+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1059-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wooley.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-14-14 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 29
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 287) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2802) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kouchi.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:25AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2262) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Chun Oakland, English; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Wakai.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-14 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to EGH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.