+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2205) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-06-18 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-02-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor