+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2418) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSM deferred the measure until 02-12-14 3:10PM in conference room 229.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-14 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.