+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 4:30pm in conference room 229.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788).
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; S. Chang, Espero, Tokuda.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Ward.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784).
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 596).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1977-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Holt, Todd.
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1327-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Mizuno, McDermott.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1186-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, LoPresti, Onishi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tokioka, Woodson.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 03-14-18 9:00AM in House conference room 429.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 301) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2903) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:08AM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2251) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-06-18 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-02-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor