+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1462) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 03-15-19 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 85) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1118) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 205) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor