+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1462-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-20-18 10:00AM in conference room 309.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 297) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2919) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-06-18.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 211.
- The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2360) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, S. Chang.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 02-06-18 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-18 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to LBR, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor