+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 37
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-17-14 9:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 922-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-10-14 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 283) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2713) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-14 9:20AM in conference room 211.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TIA/PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2156) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, Slom.
- The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Gabbard, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kahele, Solomon ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA/PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TIA/PSM/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.