+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1321-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, McDermott.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 284) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2739) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Wakai.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2085) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor