+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2182) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-06-18 1:20PM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 1:35PM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor