+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act 082, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
On July 5, 2018 in the House:
- Act 082, on 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 63-18) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 63-18).
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Inouye, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Nishimoto, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, McDermott.
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 631).
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 2:00PM in conference room 229.
- House Conferees Added: Representative Cullen added as Co-Chair.
- Re-referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 62
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 794).
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Inouye, English Co-Chairs.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Morikawa, McDermott.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 574).
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 463).
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1855-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, McDermott.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-29-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1228-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 281) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2838) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2320) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Ihara.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 10:15AM in conference room 225.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/TRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor