+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 75) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:50PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE, WAM.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor