+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Lowen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1027-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-12-14 10:30AM in House conference room 309.
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 29
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 271) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2796) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-14 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2277) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kahele ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kouchi, Solomon.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA deferred the measure until 02-11-14 1:17PM in conference room 224.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-14 1:16PM in conference room 224.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TIA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor