+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1143-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Kapela, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Lowen voting no (2) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Costales, Eli, Ichiyama, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno.
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-16-22 9:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 307) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3066) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-24-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2278) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to GVO, WAM.
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced.