+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ing, Souki excused (2).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 128-16) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 128-16).
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi, K.Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 1:45PM in conference room 325.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-16 9:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 9:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 10:35AM in conference room 325.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657).
- House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang replaced Representative(s) Pouha as conferee(s).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; K.Kahele.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Rhoads, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Pouha.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649).
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 566).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, McDermott, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1707-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16.
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1234-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Kawakami, C. Lee.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (6).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1057-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-11-16 10:30AM in House conference room 309.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 25
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 68) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-04-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2650) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 1:15PM in conference room 211.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2061) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor