+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 243, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1345).
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Act 243, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1345).
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 50) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 50).
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 12:30PM in conference room 224.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 12:30PM in conference room 224.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; J.Keohokalole, Baker Co-Chairs; Fevella.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Takumi, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Cachola, Thielen.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 731).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2153), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1598) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1300) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 83).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 909) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-05-19.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH.
- Reported from EET/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 468) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:50PM in conference room 414.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to EET/TEC, CPH.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET/TEC, WAM.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.