+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 8:35AM in conference room 312.
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-18-20 8:35AM in conference room 312.
- The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-20.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-13-20 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, CPC , referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 348) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-03-20.
- Reported from CPH/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3040) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-20 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDC.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2497) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/JDC.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 1:15PM in conference room 224.
- Referred to AEN, CPH/JDC.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor