+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Quinlan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1225-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Quinlan; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Monday, 06-22-20 11:00AM in House conference room 329.
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:30AM in conference room 309.
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-18-20 10:30AM in conference room 309.
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-20.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-13-20 9:45AM in House conference room 309.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 338) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3095) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-20 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-20 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor