+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 3:00PM in conference room 414.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.