+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 11, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1169-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
- Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 334) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3310) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2651) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee on WTL will reconsider its previous decision on 02-03-20 and will hold a public decision making on 02-07-20 1:40PM in conference room 224.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.