+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 112, 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Act 112, on 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Rhoads, Brower; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 44-14).
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 44-14) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 3:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 3:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 1:30PM in conference room 325.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 1:30PM in conference room 325.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674).
- House Conferees Appointed: Carroll, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Brower, Fukumoto Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Hee Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Galuteria Member.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 604).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1528-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Creagan, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kawakami, McDermott; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito.
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-01-14 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-14.
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-25-14 4:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1045-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Hashem, Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fukumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-13-14 11:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 264) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2493) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-14 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor