+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2486) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/TRS, WAM.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.