+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1298-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Yamane.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-16 2:00PM.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 229) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2572) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-24-16 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor