+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 111-16) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 111-16).
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nishimoto, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:30AM in conference room 016.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 2:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-16 1:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-16 1:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653).
- House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Woodson, Fukumoto Chang.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Kidani.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649).
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 565).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1673-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 2, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:31PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1203-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, C. Lee, Nakashima, McDermott.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision-making on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-16-16 2:00PM.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-14-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 25
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 66) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-04-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2549) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-19-16 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2048) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.