+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 24) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-17 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.