+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1213-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong, Lowen, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to WAL, EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 38
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 03-14-18 10:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, EDB, JUD, referral sheet 36
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 264) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2934) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-06-18.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2141) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor