+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to WLH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 43) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 02-28-20.
- Reported from JDC/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2975) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-21-20 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/CPH.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2431) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/CPH.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, JDC/CPH.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor