+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-14-18 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 37
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 429) in amended form (SD 3).
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-18.
- Report filed.
- Separated Committee Report.
- Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3).
- Floor Amendment No. 8 offered.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2910) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:08AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2317) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, L. Thielen.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-18 1:25PM in conference room 414.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT, WAM.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor