+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HOU, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 18) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HSH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.