+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Act 106, on 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 106, 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 717).
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Deferred one day 04-29-14.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-25-14
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 2-14) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 2-14).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-25-14.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Kawakami, Onishi, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker, Ihara, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-14 10:45AM in conference room 225.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Ihara, Ruderman, Slom Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Kawakami Co-Chairs; Lowen, Onishi, Thielen Members.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 600).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1582-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Har, Yamane.
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-24-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 939-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Say, Nishimoto, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Kawakami.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-11-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 258) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2518) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-21-14 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2181) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-04-14 4:00PM in conference room 225.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-14 3:30PM in conference room 225.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE, CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.