+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on IAC/CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1170-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to IAC/CPC.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Learmont, McKelvey, Quinlan.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-12-18 2:05PM in House conference room 309.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, IAC/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 251) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2786) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:08AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2477) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-18 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH/EDU, WAM.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor