+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 25
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 61) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-04-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2659) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Galuteria.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 1:00PM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2185) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-16 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, WAM.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.