+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRE/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2208) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, Chun Oakland, English, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere, Ruderman, Wakai.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-16 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/WLA, WAM.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.