+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1249-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong, C. Lee; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Cullen, Kong, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, McDermott.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Friday, 03-16-18 11:01AM in House conference room 325.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 36
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 245) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2596) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-22-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
- Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2238) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/WTL, CPH.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor