+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 313) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-03-20.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3207) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from LCA/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2852) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, S. Chang.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 10:05AM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to LCA/JDC, WAM.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA, JDC.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.