+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1106-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, McDermott.
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 278) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3084) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from PSM/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2649) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to PSM/HRE, WAM.
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor