+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TEC/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2424) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom.
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Tokuda.
- The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 02-11-14 3:30PM in conference room 414.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 1:45PM in conference room 414.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC/HRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor