+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act 064, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
On July 5, 2018 in the House:
- Act 064, on 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 174-18).
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, San Buenaventura, Luke; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 174-18) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 225.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 3:00PM in conference room 225.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 833).
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Taniguchi, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, San Buenaventura, Luke Co-Chairs; McDermott.
- Re-referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 57
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784).
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 585).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1947-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, McDermott.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-29-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1260-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-16-18 10:30AM in House conference room 423.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 36
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 240) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2626) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRE/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2438) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, English.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/JDC, WAM.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.