+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1159-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, McDermott.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-12-14 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 250) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2659) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2318) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Ihara, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor