+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Monday, 03-16-20 at 2:00 PM.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-12-20 2:31PM in House conference room 325.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 292) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3020) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-20 9:15AM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.