+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 204, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Act 204, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 179).
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Cullen, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 179) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 11:30AM in conference room 312.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-17 11:00AM in conference room 312.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Kim, Inouye Co-Chairs.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Cullen Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, McDermott.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677).
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 546).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-17.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1752) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1271), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Morikawa.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 74) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 677) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, K. Kahele.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 1:35PM in conference room 211.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 379) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Ihara.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 8:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.