+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 205) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 225.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU, WAM/JDC.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.