+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2463) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE/HMS, WAM.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor