+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 240) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi, L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2741) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-25-14 9:20AM in conference room 211.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-14 9:20AM in conference room 211.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2235) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Nishihara.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-14 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.