+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 202) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2675) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-01-16 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor