+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee on WLA deferred the measure.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WLA, WAM.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WLA.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor